+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2017 Session Law Chapter 66 Effective: 07/01/2017
- Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 17, 2017
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 25-9-1AYES – Agenbroad, Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lee, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Nye, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – Crabtree, Den Hartog, Foreman, Lakey, Nonini, Patrick, Rice, Souza, VickAbsent and excused – DavisFloor Sponsor - JordanTitle apvd - to House
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time in full – Retained on calendar
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 42-25-3AYES – Amador, Anderson, Anderst, Bell, Blanksma, Burtenshaw, Chew, Clow, Collins, Dayley, Gannon, Gibbs, Hartgen, Hixon, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, King, Kingsley, Kloc(Tway), Loertscher, Luker, Malek, Manwaring, McCrostie, McDonald, Miller, Moyle, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Rubel, Smith, Syme, Toone, Troy, VanOrden, Wintrow, Wood, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – Armstrong, Barbieri, Boyle, Chaney, Cheatham, Crane, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Gestrin, Giddings, Hanks, Harris, Holtzclaw, Kerby, Mendive(Mendive), Monks, Moon, Nate, Scott, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, Vander Woude, Zito, ZollingerAbsent – Erpelding, Shepherd, YoungbloodFloor Sponsor - WoodTitle apvd - to Senate
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor