+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 9, 2020 Session Law Chapter 64 Effective: 07/01/2020
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:10 a.m. on March 9, 2020
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 35-0-0
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 67-0-3
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Education
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2020: lower Vote
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 35
February 12, 2020: lower Vote
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 67
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
EDUCATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor