+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Vote
February 1, 2018: lower Vote
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 69
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
REVENUE
Type:
Primary Sponsor