+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on May 6, 2021 Session Law Chapter 316 Effective: 07/01/2021
- Delivered to Governor at 4:30 p.m. on May 4, 2021
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
- Signed by President; returned to House
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote - Read in full as required) – Read third time in full – PASSED - 34-0-1
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – Previously Read in Full – PASSED - 58-11-0
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Thursday, April 29, 2021
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 26, 2021
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2021: House Vote
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 11
Details:
+
−
- Vito Barbieri: Nay
- Judy Boyle: Nay
- Lance Clow: Yea
- Brent J. Crane: Yea
- John Gannon: Yea
- Terry Gestrin: Yea
- Marc Gibbs: Yea
- James Holtzclaw: Yea
- Wendy Horman: Yea
- Clark Kauffman: Yea
- Ron Mendive: Yea
- Jason A. Monks: Yea
- Mike Moyle: Yea
- John Vander Woude: Yea
- Fred Wood: Yea
- Rick D. Youngblood: Yea
- Greg Chaney: Yea
- Sue Chew: Yea
- Ryan Kerby: Yea
- John McCrostie: Yea
- Heather Scott: Yea
- Sage G. Dixon: Yea
- Caroline Nilsson Troy: Yea
- Paul Amador: Yea
- Randy Armstrong: Yea
- Megan Blanksma: Yea
- Gayann DeMordaunt: Yea
- Priscilla Giddings: Nay
- Karey Hanks: Nay
- Mike Kingsley: Yea
- Dustin Manwaring: Yea
- Dorothy Moon: Nay
- Scott Syme: Yea
- Barbara Ehardt: Yea
- Kevin Andrus: Yea
- Steve Berch: Yea
- Chad Christensen: Nay
- Linda Wright Hartgen: Yea
- Laurie Lickley: Yea
- Tammy Nichols: Nay
- Tony Wisniewski: Nay
- Julianne Young: Yea
- Rod Furniss: Yea
- Lauren Necochea: Yea
- Jim Addis: Yea
- Ben Adams: Yea
- Matthew “Matt” Bundy: Yea
- David M. Cannon: Yea
- Marco Erickson: Yea
- Greg Ferch: Yea
- Codi Galloway: Yea
- Steven C. Harris: Yea
- Gary L. Marshall: Yea
- Chris Mathias: Yea
- Brandon Mitchell: Yea
- Colin Nash: Yea
- Ron Nate: Nay
- Doug Okuniewicz: Yea
- Joe A. Palmer: Nay
- James D. Ruchti: Yea
- Charlie Shepherd: Nay
- Bruce D. Skaug: Yea
- Sally J. Toone: Yea
- Jon O. Weber: Yea
- Julie Yamamoto: Yea
April 27, 2021: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Grant Burgoyne: Yea
- Janie Ward-Engelking: Yea
- Steve Bair: Yea
- Jim Guthrie: Yea
- Lee Heider: Yea
- Todd M. Lakey: Yea
- Patti Anne Lodge: Yea
- Fred S. Martin: Yea
- Jim Rice: Yea
- Michelle Stennett: Yea
- Steven P. Thayn: Yea
- Steve Vick: Yea
- Chuck Winder: Yea
- Mark Nye: Yea
- Melissa Wintrow: Yea
- Lori Den Hartog: Yea
- Abby Lee: Yea
- Van T. Burtenshaw: Yea
- Mark Harris: Yea
- Jeff Agenbroad: Yea
- Kelly Arthur Anthon: Yea
- Carl Crabtree: Yea
- Jim L. Patrick: Yea
- Christy Zito: Yea
- C. Scott Grow: Yea
- Doug Ricks: Yea
- Dave Lent: Yea
- Jim Woodward: Yea
- Regina M. Bayer: Yea
- Daniel G. Johnson: Absent
- Kevin Cook: Yea
- Peter Riggs: Yea
+ − Sponsor
APPROPRIATIONS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor