+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2014
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 13, 2014
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full - PASSED - 35-0-0
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full - PASSED - 58-6-6
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor