+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2013
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 12:45 p.m. on April 4, 2013
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full - PASSED - 34-0-1
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 70 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 0, read three times - PASSED - 70-0-0
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
APPROPRIATIONS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor