+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 11:44 a.m. on February 20, 2013
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2013
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full - PASSED - 31-4-0
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full - PASSED - 65-0-5
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor