+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Effective: 07/01/2015
- Session Law Chapter 314
- Reported Signed by Governor on April 10, 2015
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 11:30 a.m. on April 8, 2015
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
- Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote - Read in full as required) - PASSED - 29-6-0
- Title apvd - to House
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Title apvd - to Senate
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 63 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 7, read three times - PASSED - 53-15-2
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Education
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
EDUCATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor