+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 315 Effective: 07/01/2017 SECTIONS 1 & 2; 04/04/2017 SECTION 3
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 3:17 p.m. on March 28, 2017
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote - Read in full as required) – PASSED - 35-0-0AYES – Agenbroad, Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Crabtree, Davis, Den Hartog, Foreman, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Nonini, Nye, Patrick, Rice, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – NoneAbsent and excused – NoneFloor Sponsor - AgenbroadTitle apvd - to House
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 70 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 0, read three times – PASSED - 51-11-8AYES – Amador, Anderson, Anderst, Armstrong, Barbieri, Bell, Blanksma, Burtenshaw, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Erpelding, Gibbs, Giddings, Harris, Hartgen, Horman, Jordan(Ringo), Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Manwaring, McCrostie, Mendive, Miller, Moon, Nate, Packer, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Rubel, Shepherd, Smith, Syme, Toone, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wood, Youngblood, Zito, Zollinger, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – Boyle, Chaney, Gestrin, Hanks, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Kingsley, Moyle, Scott, Stevenson, ThompsonAbsent – Crane, Dixon, Gannon, Malek, McDonald, Monks, Palmer, WintrowFloor Sponsor - KingTitle apvd - to Senate
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
APPROPRIATIONS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor