+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Effective: 07/01/2015
- Session Law Chapter 240
- Reported Signed by Governor on April 3, 2015
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 11:20 a.m. on March 30, 2015
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
- Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote - Read in full as required) - PASSED - 34-0-1
- Title apvd - to House
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Title apvd - to Senate
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 68 Nays 2 Abs/Excd 0, read three times - PASSED - 55-14-1
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
APPROPRIATIONS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor