+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2019 Session Law Chapter 317 Effective: 04/05/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:30 p.m. on April 2, 2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2019: lower Vote
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 35
March 25, 2019: lower Vote
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 67
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
APPROPRIATIONS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor