+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2013
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 11:40 a.m. on April 2, 2013
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full - PASSED - 33-0-2
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 48 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 22, read three times - PASSED - 68-0-2
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Business
- Reported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsors (2)
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor