+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2013
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 12:45 p.m. on April 4, 2013
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full - PASSED - 29-6-0
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 66 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 4, read three times - PASSED - 56-10-4
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor