+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 156 Effective: 07/01/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 9:50 a.m. on March 21, 2017
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 33-1-1AYES – Agenbroad, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Crabtree, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Nonini, Nye, Patrick, Rice, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – ForemanAbsent and excused – AnthonFloor Sponsor - Ward-EngelkingTitle apvd - to House
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 50-19-1AYES – Amador, Anderson, Anderst, Armstrong, Bell, Blanksma, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Collins, Dayley, Dixon, Gannon, Gibbs, Giddings, Hartgen, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kingsley, Kloc, Loertscher, Malek, Manwaring, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Packer, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Rubel, Shepherd, Smith, Stevenson, Syme, Thompson, Toone, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – Barbieri, Boyle, Clow, Crane, DeMordaunt, Gestrin, Hanks, Harris, Hixon, Luker, Monks, Moon, Moyle, Nate, Palmer, Scott, Vander Woude, Zito, ZollingerAbsent – ErpeldingFloor Sponsor - KingTitle apvd - to Senate
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
APPROPRIATIONS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor