+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2019 Session Law Chapter 321 Effective: 07/01/2019
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on April 8, 2019
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
- Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
- House Concurred in Senate Amendments
- Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence; objection
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from the Senate Amended
- Referred to Revenue & Taxation for concurrence recommendation
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
- Amendments reported printed
- Reported out as amended; filed for first reading
- Amendments ordered printed
- Placed in the Committee of the Whole
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2019: lower Vote
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 70
March 8, 2019: lower Vote
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 68
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
REVENUE
Type:
Primary Sponsor