+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – Previously Read in Full – PASSED - 62-6-2
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Vote
February 26, 2021: House Vote
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Vito Barbieri: Yea
- Judy Boyle: Yea
- Lance Clow: Yea
- Brent J. Crane: Yea
- John Gannon: Yea
- Terry Gestrin: Yea
- Marc Gibbs: Yea
- James Holtzclaw: Yea
- Wendy Horman: Yea
- Clark Kauffman: Yea
- Ron Mendive: Yea
- Jason A. Monks: Yea
- Mike Moyle: Yea
- John Vander Woude: Absent
- Fred Wood: Yea
- Rick D. Youngblood: Yea
- Greg Chaney: Yea
- Sue Chew: Nay
- Ryan Kerby: Yea
- John McCrostie: Yea
- Ilana Rubel: Nay
- Heather Scott: Yea
- Sage G. Dixon: Yea
- Caroline Nilsson Troy: Yea
- Paul Amador: Absent
- Randy Armstrong: Yea
- Megan Blanksma: Yea
- Gayann DeMordaunt: Yea
- Priscilla Giddings: Yea
- Karey Hanks: Yea
- Mike Kingsley: Yea
- Dustin Manwaring: Yea
- Dorothy Moon: Yea
- Scott Syme: Yea
- Barbara Ehardt: Yea
- Kevin Andrus: Yea
- Steve Berch: Nay
- Chad Christensen: Yea
- Muffy Davis: Yea
- Brooke Green: Nay
- Linda Wright Hartgen: Yea
- Laurie Lickley: Yea
- Tony Wisniewski: Yea
- Julianne Young: Yea
- Rod Furniss: Yea
- Lauren Necochea: Nay
- Jim Addis: Yea
- Aaron von Ehlinger: Yea
- Ben Adams: Yea
- Matthew “Matt” Bundy: Yea
- David M. Cannon: Yea
- Marco Erickson: Yea
- Greg Ferch: Yea
- Codi Galloway: Yea
- Steven C. Harris: Yea
- Gary L. Marshall: Yea
- Chris Mathias: Nay
- Brandon Mitchell: Yea
- Colin Nash: Yea
- Ron Nate: Yea
- Doug Okuniewicz: Yea
- Joe A. Palmer: Yea
- James D. Ruchti: Yea
- Charlie Shepherd: Yea
- Bruce D. Skaug: Yea
- Sally J. Toone: Yea
- Jon O. Weber: Yea
- Julie Yamamoto: Yea
+ − Sponsor
REVENUE
Type:
Primary Sponsor