+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2017 Session Law Chapter 193 Effective: 01/01/2018
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 22, 2017
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 31-1-3AYES – Ackerman(Den Hartog), Agenbroad, Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Crabtree, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lee, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Nonini, Nye, Patrick, Rice, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, WinderNAYS – ForemanAbsent and excused – Davis, Lakey, Ward-EngelkingFloor Sponsor - StennettTitle apvd - to House
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 65-4-1AYES – Amador, Anderson, Anderst, Armstrong, Barbieri, Blanksma, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Giddings, Hanks, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, Manwaring, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moon, Moyle, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Rubel, Shepherd, Smith, Stevenson, Syme, Thompson, Toone, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Zito, Zollinger, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – Harris, Kingsley, Nate, ScottAbsent – BellFloor Sponsor - GestrinTitle apvd - to Senate
- U.C. to place at bottom of House bills of third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Resources & Conservation
- Reported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor