+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
- Read Third Time in Full – Previously Read in Full – FAILED - 25-42-3
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Vote
February 25, 2021: House Vote
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 42
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Vito Barbieri: Nay
- Judy Boyle: Absent
- Lance Clow: Nay
- Brent J. Crane: Nay
- John Gannon: Yea
- Terry Gestrin: Nay
- Marc Gibbs: Yea
- James Holtzclaw: Nay
- Wendy Horman: Nay
- Clark Kauffman: Yea
- Ron Mendive: Nay
- Jason A. Monks: Nay
- Mike Moyle: Nay
- John Vander Woude: Absent
- Fred Wood: Yea
- Rick D. Youngblood: Yea
- Greg Chaney: Nay
- Sue Chew: Yea
- Ryan Kerby: Nay
- John McCrostie: Yea
- Ilana Rubel: Yea
- Heather Scott: Nay
- Sage G. Dixon: Nay
- Caroline Nilsson Troy: Yea
- Paul Amador: Absent
- Randy Armstrong: Nay
- Megan Blanksma: Nay
- Gayann DeMordaunt: Nay
- Priscilla Giddings: Nay
- Karey Hanks: Nay
- Mike Kingsley: Nay
- Dustin Manwaring: Yea
- Dorothy Moon: Nay
- Scott Syme: Yea
- Barbara Ehardt: Nay
- Kevin Andrus: Nay
- Steve Berch: Yea
- Chad Christensen: Nay
- Muffy Davis: Yea
- Brooke Green: Yea
- Linda Wright Hartgen: Yea
- Laurie Lickley: Yea
- Tony Wisniewski: Nay
- Julianne Young: Nay
- Rod Furniss: Nay
- Lauren Necochea: Yea
- Jim Addis: Nay
- Aaron von Ehlinger: Nay
- Ben Adams: Nay
- Matthew “Matt” Bundy: Nay
- David M. Cannon: Nay
- Marco Erickson: Yea
- Greg Ferch: Nay
- Codi Galloway: Nay
- Steven C. Harris: Nay
- Gary L. Marshall: Nay
- Chris Mathias: Yea
- Brandon Mitchell: Yea
- Colin Nash: Yea
- Ron Nate: Nay
- Doug Okuniewicz: Nay
- Joe A. Palmer: Nay
- James D. Ruchti: Yea
- Charlie Shepherd: Nay
- Bruce D. Skaug: Yea
- Sally J. Toone: Yea
- Jon O. Weber: Nay
- Julie Yamamoto: Nay
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor