+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 25, 2019
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2019 Session Law Chapter 206 Effective: 07/01/2019
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2019: lower Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 32
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2019: lower Vote
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 70
+ − Sponsor
WAYS
Type:
Primary Sponsor