+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (45)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on April 28, 2021 Session Law Chapter 294 Effective: 07/01/2021
- Delivered to Governor at 2:20 p.m. on April 27, 2021
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
- Signed by President; returned to House
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Title apvd - to enrol
- Read third time in full as amended in Senate – Previously Read in Full – PASSED - 34-33-3
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 26, 2021
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
- Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
- House Concurred in Senate Amendments
- Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation & Defense for concurrence recommendation
- Returned from the Senate Amended
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time as amended in the Senate – PASSED - 31-3-1
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
- Amendments reported printed
- Reported out as amended; filed for first reading
- Amendments ordered printed
- Placed in the Committee of the Whole
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to 14th Order for amendment
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 67 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 3, read in full as required – PASSED - 41-28-1
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
- Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
- Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
- Reported out without recommendation as amended
- Referred to the Committee of the Whole
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (3)
April 26, 2021: House Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 33
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Vito Barbieri: Absent
- Judy Boyle: Nay
- Lance Clow: Yea
- Brent J. Crane: Nay
- John Gannon: Nay
- Terry Gestrin: Yea
- Marc Gibbs: Absent
- James Holtzclaw: Yea
- Wendy Horman: Yea
- Clark Kauffman: Yea
- Ron Mendive: Nay
- Jason A. Monks: Nay
- Mike Moyle: Nay
- John Vander Woude: Nay
- Fred Wood: Yea
- Rick D. Youngblood: Yea
- Greg Chaney: Yea
- Sue Chew: Yea
- Ryan Kerby: Nay
- John McCrostie: Yea
- Ilana Rubel: Yea
- Heather Scott: Nay
- Sage G. Dixon: Nay
- Caroline Nilsson Troy: Yea
- Paul Amador: Yea
- Randy Armstrong: Nay
- Megan Blanksma: Nay
- Gayann DeMordaunt: Yea
- Priscilla Giddings: Nay
- Karey Hanks: Nay
- Mike Kingsley: Nay
- Dustin Manwaring: Yea
- Dorothy Moon: Nay
- Scott Syme: Yea
- Barbara Ehardt: Nay
- Kevin Andrus: Nay
- Steve Berch: Yea
- Chad Christensen: Nay
- Linda Wright Hartgen: Yea
- Laurie Lickley: Yea
- Tammy Nichols: Nay
- Tony Wisniewski: Nay
- Julianne Young: Nay
- Rod Furniss: Nay
- Lauren Necochea: Yea
- Jim Addis: Yea
- Aaron von Ehlinger: Nay
- Ben Adams: Nay
- Matthew “Matt” Bundy: Nay
- David M. Cannon: Yea
- Marco Erickson: Absent
- Greg Ferch: Nay
- Codi Galloway: Yea
- Steven C. Harris: Nay
- Gary L. Marshall: Yea
- Chris Mathias: Yea
- Brandon Mitchell: Nay
- Colin Nash: Yea
- Ron Nate: Nay
- Doug Okuniewicz: Nay
- Joe A. Palmer: Yea
- James D. Ruchti: Yea
- Charlie Shepherd: Nay
- Bruce D. Skaug: Nay
- Sally J. Toone: Yea
- Jon O. Weber: Yea
- Julie Yamamoto: Yea
April 12, 2021: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Grant Burgoyne: Yea
- Janie Ward-Engelking: Yea
- Steve Bair: Yea
- Jim Guthrie: Yea
- Lee Heider: Yea
- Todd M. Lakey: Yea
- Patti Anne Lodge: Yea
- Fred S. Martin: Nay
- Jim Rice: Yea
- Michelle Stennett: Yea
- Steven P. Thayn: Yea
- Steve Vick: Absent
- Chuck Winder: Yea
- Mark Nye: Yea
- Melissa Wintrow: Yea
- Lori Den Hartog: Yea
- Abby Lee: Yea
- Mary Souza: Yea
- Van T. Burtenshaw: Yea
- Mark Harris: Yea
- Jeff Agenbroad: Yea
- Kelly Arthur Anthon: Yea
- Carl Crabtree: Yea
- Jim L. Patrick: Yea
- Christy Zito: Nay
- C. Scott Grow: Yea
- Doug Ricks: Yea
- Dave Lent: Yea
- David Nelson: Yea
- Jim Woodward: Yea
- Regina M. Bayer: Nay
- Daniel G. Johnson: Yea
- Kevin Cook: Yea
- Ali Rabe: Yea
- Peter Riggs: Yea
March 10, 2021: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Vito Barbieri: Nay
- Judy Boyle: Yea
- Lance Clow: Yea
- Brent J. Crane: Nay
- John Gannon: Yea
- Terry Gestrin: Yea
- Marc Gibbs: Yea
- James Holtzclaw: Yea
- Wendy Horman: Yea
- Clark Kauffman: Yea
- Ron Mendive: Nay
- Jason A. Monks: Nay
- Mike Moyle: Nay
- John Vander Woude: Nay
- Fred Wood: Yea
- Rick D. Youngblood: Yea
- Greg Chaney: Yea
- Sue Chew: Yea
- Ryan Kerby: Yea
- John McCrostie: Yea
- Ilana Rubel: Yea
- Heather Scott: Nay
- Sage G. Dixon: Nay
- Caroline Nilsson Troy: Yea
- Paul Amador: Yea
- Randy Armstrong: Yea
- Megan Blanksma: Nay
- Gayann DeMordaunt: Yea
- Priscilla Giddings: Nay
- Karey Hanks: Nay
- Mike Kingsley: Nay
- Dustin Manwaring: Yea
- Dorothy Moon: Nay
- Scott Syme: Yea
- Barbara Ehardt: Nay
- Kevin Andrus: Nay
- Steve Berch: Yea
- Chad Christensen: Nay
- Muffy Davis: Absent
- Brooke Green: Yea
- Linda Wright Hartgen: Yea
- Laurie Lickley: Yea
- Tammy Nichols: Nay
- Tony Wisniewski: Yea
- Julianne Young: Nay
- Rod Furniss: Yea
- Lauren Necochea: Yea
- Jim Addis: Yea
- Aaron von Ehlinger: Nay
- Ben Adams: Nay
- Matthew “Matt” Bundy: Nay
- David M. Cannon: Yea
- Marco Erickson: Nay
- Greg Ferch: Nay
- Codi Galloway: Yea
- Steven C. Harris: Nay
- Gary L. Marshall: Yea
- Chris Mathias: Yea
- Brandon Mitchell: Yea
- Colin Nash: Yea
- Ron Nate: Nay
- Doug Okuniewicz: Nay
- Joe A. Palmer: Yea
- James D. Ruchti: Yea
- Charlie Shepherd: Yea
- Bruce D. Skaug: Nay
- Sally J. Toone: Yea
- Jon O. Weber: Nay
- Julie Yamamoto: Yea
+ − Sponsor
TRANSPORTATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor