+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee and referred to: Transportation
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Title apvd - to Senate
- Read Third Time in Full - PASSED - 50-19-1
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 2, 2015
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
TRANSPORTATION AND DEFENSE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor