+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:55 a.m. on March 14, 2019
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 14, 2019 Session Law Chapter 83 Effective: 07/01/2019
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2019: lower Vote
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 34
- Absent: 1
February 19, 2019: lower Vote
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 69
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor