+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on February 14, 2019 Session Law Chapter 24 Effective: 02/14/2019
- Delivered to Governor at 11:15 a.m. on February 13, 2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
February 11, 2019: lower Vote
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 33
- Absent: 2
January 30, 2019: lower Vote
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 69
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor