+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- U.C. to be returned to Revenue & Taxation Committee
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Friday, February 17, 2017
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Tuesday, February 14, 2017
- U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 13, 2017
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
REVENUE
Type:
Primary Sponsor