+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0505)
On April 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 505 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB585ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS R (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (97-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 986308657-E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Health Care
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 986308657
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor