+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 8, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0855)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 855 (effective 7/1/97)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2210ER)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's rec. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2210ER)
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 4-N)
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 977018813-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 2
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 977018813