+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0448)
On March 31, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 448 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1044ER)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider pass by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Insurance (Hargrove)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 062655252
+ − Votes (7)
March 2, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2006: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2006: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor