+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106123D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1763ES1
- Printed as engrossed 19106123D-ES1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 19104632D