+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 650 (effective 7/1/15)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1940ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (79-Y 17-N)
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 17-N)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned C&L sub: Worker's Compensation
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 35-N)
- Read third time and passed House (63-Y 35-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1940H2
- Committee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 15104921D-H2
- Committee substitute from Commerce and Labor rejected 15104850D-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104921D-H2
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 2-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 15104850D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103387D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 26, 2015: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 26, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 17-N)
February 24, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2015: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 35-N)
February 6, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2015: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 2-N)
February 5, 2015: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor