+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 14, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 622 (effective - see bill)
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB59ER)
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB59H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 065218476-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 065218476-H1
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement (Putney)
On December 14, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 065125476