+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 515 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1942ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1942H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104573D-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104573D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103414D
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor