+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1417 is now Act 1012
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- Received from the House.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by L. Eads
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Watson
Amendment H1
Sponsored by M. Gray
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2019: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
April 8, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
April 2, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 14