+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1229 is now Act 218
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by S. Meeks
Amendment H1
Sponsored by S. Meeks
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4