+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from GVO/PSM/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1223), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO/PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 2:46PM in conference room 224.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO/PSM/AEN, WAM.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor