+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6).
- Reported from OMH/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1793), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Ichiyama, Say, Fukumoto.
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, LoPresti, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Thielen.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH/EEP on Wednesday, 04-12-17 11:15AM in conference room 312.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to OMH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 41
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 443) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1393) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1218), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Kim.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 2:46PM in conference room 224.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor