+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3270), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 2:55PM in conference room 224.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO, WAM.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor