+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to TRE/WLA.
- Reported from PSM/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3175), with recommendation of referral to TRE/WLA.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green, Taniguchi.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 03-23-16 1:30PM in conference room 414.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/HOU, TRE/WLA.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Offered.