+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 47
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 443).
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3415) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom.
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-16 1:00PM in conference room 211.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3157), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ihara, Slom.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-16 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Offered.