+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-12-19.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, with Senator Fevella voting "No".
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-12-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2072) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1613), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:50PM in conference room 225.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Offered.