+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent.
On April 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa).
On April 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1657) with recommendation of adoption.
- One Day Notice 04-05-23.
On April 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads.
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee on AEN will reconsider its previous decision made on 03-29-23 and will hold a public decision making on 04-03-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite, Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
- The recommendation was not adopted.
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN.
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor