+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1586), with recommendation of referral to JDC/WAM.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor