+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1181), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-24-17 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Offered.