+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 30
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 434) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House.
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-22-21.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 989) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2).
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-10-21 9:46AM; Via Videoconference.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 289), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDC.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN, JDC.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor