+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to JDC.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3429), with recommendation of referral to JDC.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-20 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, JDC.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor