+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1463) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1159), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Taniguchi.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 1:30PM in conference room 016.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor