+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1059), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-13 2:05PM in conference room Auditorium.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.