+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1219), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDL.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor