+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1177), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 10:00AM in conference room 225.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor