+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 41
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 433) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1391) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1163), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 1:20PM in conference room 224.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN, WAM.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor