+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 53
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 512).
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-05-18.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3401) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to JDC.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/JDC.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.